This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/31/2020 at 08:03:57 (UTC).

WILMINGTON TRUST NA (AS TRUSTEE FOR THE REGISTERED HOLDERS OF JPMDB vs. IAH 15747 HOTEL LLC

Case Summary

On 07/06/2020 WILMINGTON TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR THE REGISTERED HOLDERS OF JPMDB filed an Other lawsuit against IAH 15747 HOTEL LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LAUREN REEDER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9769

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LAUREN REEDER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILMINGTON TRUST NA (AS TRUSTEE FOR THE REGISTERED HOLDERS OF JPMDB

Defendant

IAH 15747 HOTEL LLC

Receiver

CRUCK, SCOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAUVIN, CHRISTOPHER LYN

1722 Routh Stre

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

Bond Approval Fee

07/10/2020: Bond Approval Fee

Oath of Receiver

07/13/2020: Oath of Receiver

Doubletree International Lender's Receiver Bond

07/15/2020: Doubletree International Lender's Receiver Bond

Bond Letter

07/15/2020: Bond Letter

Filing letter

07/17/2020: Filing letter

Envelope

07/17/2020: Envelope

Check

07/17/2020: Check

Clerk's certificate of cash deposit in lieu of receiver bond per order of the court

07/17/2020: Clerk's certificate of cash deposit in lieu of receiver bond per order of the court

Letter

07/17/2020: Letter

Letter

07/17/2020: Letter

Applicant's Bond For Appointment Of Receiver

07/17/2020: Applicant's Bond For Appointment Of Receiver

Proposed Agreed Order Appointing Receiver

07/06/2020: Proposed Agreed Order Appointing Receiver

EXHIBIT 01

07/06/2020: EXHIBIT 01

PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED ORIGINAL PETITION AND AGREED APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY RECEIVER

07/06/2020: PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED ORIGINAL PETITION AND AGREED APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY RECEIVER

ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

07/07/2020: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED; Order Signed: 7/7/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO APPOINT RECEIVER GRANTED; Order Signed: 7/7/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CHAUVIN, CHRISTOPHER LYN; Person Filing: WILMINGTON TRUST NA (AS TRUSTEE FOR THE REGISTERED HOLDERS OF JPMDB;

    Read MoreRead Less