This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:24:46 (UTC).

WILLIS, JACQUELINE W vs. WILLIS, JOHNNY B

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 WILLIS, JACQUELINE W filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WILLIS, JOHNNY B. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0776

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIS, JACQUELINE W

Defendant

WILLIS, JOHNNY B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OBERHOLTZER, ROBERT W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2005
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2005
  • DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2005
  • ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - OBERHOLTZER, ROBERT W. Person Filing - WILLIS, JACQUELINE W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - OBERHOLTZER, ROBERT W. Person Filing - WILLIS, JACQUELINE W

    Read MoreRead Less