This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 12/25/2022 at 07:41:08 (UTC).

WILLIAMS, MARK ANTHONY vs. LIVE NATION WORLDWIDE INC

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 WILLIAMS, MARK ANTHONY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LIVE NATION WORLDWIDE INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE H PALMER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8273

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE H PALMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS, MARK ANTHONY

Defendants

LIVE NATION WORLDWIDE INC

BOARDMAN, SEYTH

Groveport, OH 43125

BUTLER, KEITH

Houston, TX 77083

GRAHAM, AUBREY DRAKE (AKA "DRAKE")

Angeles, CA 91032

GUTTFREUND, SASCHA STONE

Austin, TX 78739

HICKS, TREY

Autin, TX 78745

MILLER, MARK

Houston, TX 77054

PLATT, DARRYL

Pearland, TX 77584

SILBERSTEIN, BRENT

Austin, TX 78704

SOUTH TEXAS EMS LLC

9898 Bissonnet Street

Houston, TX 77036

WEBSTER, JACQUES BERMON (II) (AKA "TRAVIS SCOTT" AKA CACTUS JACK)

Cypress, TX 77429

WAVRA, BRADLEY

Tarzana, CA 91356

APEX SECURITY

APPLE INC

ASM GLOBAL LLC

ASM GLOBAL PARENT INC

BRYE INC (DBA B3 RISK SOLUTIONS LLC)

BWG INC (AKA BWG LIVE)

62 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOX, SHAWN

 

Court Documents

Filing letter re: additional fees for citations

12/13/2022: Filing letter re: additional fees for citations

Plaintiffs Original Petition

12/01/2022: Plaintiffs Original Petition

Request for Issuance of Service

12/01/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

12/01/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

12/01/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

12/01/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

12/01/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

12/01/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

12/01/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

12/01/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

12/01/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

12/01/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

12/01/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

12/01/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

12/01/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

12/01/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

12/01/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

12/01/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ASM GLOBAL PARENT LLC BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT CORPORATION; Issued: 12/21/2022; Tracking: 74091852; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: VALLE SERVICES LLC BY SERVING THROUGH THE TEXAS SECRETARY OF; Issued: 12/14/2022; Tracking: 74088798; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: UNIFIED COMMAND LLC BY SERVING THROUGH THE TEXAS SECRETARY OF; Issued: 12/14/2022; Tracking: 74088792; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TRISTAR SPORTS & ENTERTAINMENT GROUP INC BY SERVING; Issued: 12/14/2022; Tracking: 74088790; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: RE:SOURCE EVENT GROUP LLC BY SERVING THROUGH THE TEXAS SECRETARY; Issued: 12/14/2022; Tracking: 74088789; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GRAND HUSTLE MANAGEMENT INC (DBA GRAND HUSTLE RECORDS) BY SERVING; Issued: 12/14/2022; Tracking: 74088787; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: EPIC RECORDS INC (DBA EPIC RECORDS) BY SERVING THROUGH THE TEXAS; Issued: 12/14/2022; Tracking: 74088785; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: EIGHTEENTWENTYSIX LLC BY SERVING THROUGH THE TEXAS SECRETARY; Issued: 12/14/2022; Tracking: 74088784; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: AJ MELINO & ASSOCIATES INC BY SERVING THROUGH THE TEXAS SECRETARY; Issued: 12/14/2022; Tracking: 74088781; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: XX GLOBAL LLC BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT ERESIDENTAGENT INC; Issued: 12/14/2022; Tracking: 74087979; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SOUTH TEXAS EMS LLC; Issued: 12/14/2022; Tracking: 74087840; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SILBERSTEIN, BRENT; Issued: 12/14/2022; Tracking: 74087839; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PLATT, DARRYL; Issued: 12/14/2022; Tracking: 74087838; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MILLER, MARK; Issued: 12/14/2022; Tracking: 74087837; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HICKS, TREY; Issued: 12/14/2022; Tracking: 74087835; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GUTTFREUND, SASCHA STONE; Issued: 12/14/2022; Tracking: 74087834; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION(NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GRAHAM, AUBREY DRAKE (AKA "DRAKE"); Issued: 12/14/2022; Tracking: 74087833; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BUTLER, KEITH; Issued: 12/14/2022; Tracking: 74087832; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (OHIO); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BOARDMAN, SEYTH; Issued: 12/14/2022; Tracking: 74087831; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FOX, SHAWN; Person Filing: WILLIAMS, MARK ANTHONY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less