This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/08/2015 at 02:18:55 (UTC).

WILLIAMS, LINDA vs. GARLOCK INC

Case Summary

On 01/27/2005 WILLIAMS, LINDA filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against GARLOCK INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7267

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILLIAMS, LINDA

WILLIAMS, STACEY (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS REPRESENTATIVE OF THE HEIRS AND

Defendants

GARLOCK INC

TYCO VALVES AND CONTROLS, INC.

GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED

A W CHESTERTON COMPANY

FLOWSERVE (FKA DURAMETALLIC)

DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION

DURABLA MANUFACTURING CO

SEPCO CORPORATION

PARKER HANNIFIN CORP

DANA CORPORATION

CERTAINTEED CORP

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC

BONDEX INTERNATIONAL

RPM INC

BEAZER EAST INC

T H AGRICULTURE & NUTRITION LLC

PHILLIPS ELECTRONICS NORTH AMERICA CORP

TAMKO ROOFING PRODUCTS INC

54 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LANIER, W. MARK

BULLOCK, R. CRAIG

Defendant Attorneys

FULLER, L. HAYES III

SCOFIELD, DENISE URZENDOWSKI

HUEBER, SUSAN JAN

WARE, JAMES L.

BOYD, ERNEST W

Other Attorneys

SKAGGS, JERAMY MITCHELL

FARRELL, WILLIAM HOWARD

WRIGHT, ROBIN WADE

POFF, FRANKLIN ALBRIGHT JR.

LOWERY, JAMES A. III

ELLISTON, GARY D.

SCHREIBER, JOSEPH MICHAEL

WHITE, CLAY M.

ALMQUIST, ARTHUR RAY

BRIDGER, JOHN W.

FRASE, LAURA ANN

BARRON, BARBARA JANE

MILTENBERGER, LEWIS C.

2 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2014
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2009
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2009
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2009
  • PARTIAL REMOVAL TO BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2005
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2005
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WARE, JAMES L. Person Filing - DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BARRON, BARBARA JANE Person Filing - SIEMENS ENERGY & AUTOMATION INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2005
  • MOTION TRANSFER VENUE : Filing Attorney - BARRON, BARBARA JANE Person Filing - SIEMENS ENERGY & AUTOMATION INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FULLER, L. HAYES III Person Filing - GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2005
  • MOTION TRANSFER VENUE : Filing Attorney - FULLER, L. HAYES III Person Filing - GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ABBOTT, LAWRENCE EMERSON Person Filing - TYCO VALVES AND CONTROLS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2005
  • MOTION TRANSFER VENUE : Filing Attorney - ABBOTT, LAWRENCE EMERSON Person Filing - TYCO VALVES AND CONTROLS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LANIER, W. MARK Person Filing - WILLIAMS, LINDA

    Read MoreRead Less