This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:17:24 (UTC).

WILLIAMS, JAMES E vs. MOSTYN, JOHN STEVEN

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 WILLIAMS, JAMES E filed an Other lawsuit against MOSTYN, JOHN STEVEN. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0668

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS, JAMES E

Defendants

MOSTYN, JOHN STEVEN

JOHN STEVEN MOSTYN P C (DBA THE MOSTYN LAW FIRM)

MOSTYN LAW FIRM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARLAND, JACK J. JR.

Defendant Attorney

SIGMAN, RENE MICHELLE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2005
  • DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SIGMAN, RENE MICHELLE Person Filing - MOSTYN LAW FIRM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SIGMAN, RENE MICHELLE Person Filing - MOSTYN, JOHN STEVEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SIGMAN, RENE MICHELLE Person Filing - JOHN STEVEN MOSTYN P C (DBA THE MOSTYN LAW FIRM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2005
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SIGMAN, RENE MICHELLE Person Filing - MOSTYN LAW FIRM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2005
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SIGMAN, RENE MICHELLE Person Filing - MOSTYN, JOHN STEVEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SIGMAN, RENE MICHELLE Person Filing - JOHN STEVEN MOSTYN P C (DBA THE MOSTYN LAW FIRM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2005
  • ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GARLAND, JACK J. JR. Person Filing - WILLIAMS, JAMES E

    Read MoreRead Less