Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/16/2020 at 01:14:17 (UTC).

WILLIAMS, EUGENE vs. IN RE ASBESTOS MDL

Case Summary

On 07/02/2015 WILLIAMS, EUGENE filed an Other lawsuit against IN RE ASBESTOS MDL. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8239

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS, EUGENE

Defendants

IN RE ASBESTOS MDL

ABEX CORPORATION (AS PREDECESSOR TO THE PNEUMO-ABEX CORPORATION)

ABLE SUPPLY COMPANY

ALCOA INC

AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION

AMETEK INC

AQUA-CHEM INC

ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED

A W CHESTERTON COMPANY

BAYER CROPSCIENCE INC (A/K/A AMCHEM PRODUCTS INC SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST

AMCHEM PRODUCTS INC

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

CHICAGO BRIDGE & IRON COMPANY

CRANE CO

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC

CSR LTD

DANA CORPORATION

FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

25 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DODD, RICHARD ALAN

Other Attorneys

CARROLL, MARCUS ALAN

 

Court Documents

Exhibit C

07/02/2015: Exhibit C

Exhibit B

07/02/2015: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

07/02/2015: Exhibit A

Notice of Transfer under Rule Section 90.010(b)

07/02/2015: Notice of Transfer under Rule Section 90.010(b)

Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation's Opposition To Petitioner's Request For Pre-Suit Deposition And Motion To Quash Same

07/22/2015: Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation's Opposition To Petitioner's Request For Pre-Suit Deposition And Motion To Quash Same

Notice of Appearance of counsel

08/14/2015: Notice of Appearance of counsel

Notice Of Bankruptcy And Automatic Stay

02/19/2016: Notice Of Bankruptcy And Automatic Stay

DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

06/17/2016: DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2016
  • DocketDescription: EACH PAY OWN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • DocketDescription: DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION; Order Signed: 6/17/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • HearingCourt: 011; Docket Type: Trial Motion Docket - Rule 13 Asbestosis; Reason: COMPEL APPEAR DEPO - MTN (TRCP 201); Results: Hearing Held; Comments: ORDER TO FOLLOW; Requesting Party: DODD, RICHARD ALAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • HearingCourt: 011; Docket Type: Trial Motion Docket - Rule 13 Asbestosis; Reason: COMPEL APPEAR DEPO - MTN (TRCP 201); Results: Hearing Held; Comments: NEED ADDL INFORMATION; Requesting Party: DODD, RICHARD ALAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DODD, RICHARD ALAN; Person Filing: WILLIAMS, EUGENE;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMCHEM PRODUCTS INC (FKA RHONE-POULENC BASIC CHEMICALS) is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN BRAKE SHOE AND FOUNDRY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ALCOA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ABLE SUPPLY COMPANY is a litigant