This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:08:05 (UTC).

WILLIAMS, DEDRA vs. WILLIAMS, JOSEPH

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 WILLIAMS, DEDRA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WILLIAMS, JOSEPH. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8064

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS, DEDRA

Defendant

WILLIAMS, JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCDERMOTT, JOHN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2005
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF WAIVER ORDER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING ASSIGNMENT OF WAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2005
  • FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2005
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2005
  • WAIVER CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCDERMOTT, JOHN Person Filing - WILLIAMS, DEDRA

    Read MoreRead Less