This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:34:55 (UTC).

WILLIAMS, ANTHONY vs. RELIANTHEART INC

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 WILLIAMS, ANTHONY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against RELIANTHEART INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LARRY WEIMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1669

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LARRY WEIMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS, ANTHONY

Defendant

RELIANTHEART INC

Other

RELIANTHEART INC (DELAWARE CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED

8965 Interchange Drive

Houston, TX 77054

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPENCER, JENNIFER JACKSON

 

Court Documents

Citation Corporate

06/16/2020: Citation Corporate

Exhibit D

05/26/2020: Exhibit D

Exhibit C

05/26/2020: Exhibit C

Exhibit B

05/26/2020: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

05/26/2020: Exhibit A

Plaintiff's Original Petition and Discovery Requests

05/26/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition and Discovery Requests

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: RELIANTHEART INC (DELAWARE CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED; Issued: 5/27/2020; Served: 6/15/2020; Tracking: 73752943; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SPENCER, JENNIFER JACKSON; Person Filing: WILLIAMS, ANTHONY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less