This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:36:32 (UTC).

WILDFLOWER GREEN HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION vs. ZOU, JIA

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 WILDFLOWER GREEN HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ZOU, JIA. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LARRY WEIMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1692

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LARRY WEIMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILDFLOWER GREEN HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendant

ZOU, JIA

Houston, TX 77072

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCLAIN, MELISSA

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Service

06/05/2020: Affidavit of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/26/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Exhibit A

05/26/2020: Exhibit A

Plaintiffs Original Petition and Requests for Disclosure

05/26/2020: Plaintiffs Original Petition and Requests for Disclosure

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ZOU, JIA; Issued: 5/27/2020; Served: 5/28/2020; Tracking: 73752947; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCLAIN, MELISSA; Person Filing: WILDFLOWER GREEN HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION;

    Read MoreRead Less