Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/07/2015 at 14:29:04 (UTC).

WILDER, ISAAC vs. A W CHESTERTON

Case Summary

On 10/13/2005 WILDER, ISAAC filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******240L

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILDER, ISAAC

Defendants

A W CHESTERTON

ABLE SUPPLY COMPANY

AJAX BOILER & HEATER CO

AJAX BOILER INC

ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

ALCOA INC

ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA LLC

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

AMERICAN STANDARD INC

AMETEK INC

AMOCO OIL COMPANY

AMOCO PRODUCTION COMPANY

AQUA-CHEM INC

ASARCO INC

ASHLAND OIL INC

ASTEN GROUP INC

ASTEN INC

ASTENJOHNSON INC

ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY

229 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COON, BRENT WAYNE

Defendant Attorney

THACKSTON, ROBERT EDWIN

Other Attorneys

TIDWELL, JOHN L.

LABOON, JOHN ANDREW

HOGAN, TIMOTHY J.

OLIVER, DAVID ARTHUR JR.

HUNTER, HAROLD HARVEY

HARTMAN, ANDREW STUART

RICE, B. STEVE

LEDYARD, DAVID W.

HAZEN, SCOTT PAUL

BARRON, BARBARA JANE

ROBBINS, LAUREN MILLER

DE LOS SANTOS, EDDY L. JR.

HENRY, LESLIE M.

SLAUGHTER, EDWARD MORRIS

WARE, JAMES L.

HORNE, NATHAN RAY

FRASE, LAURA ANN

MCCRACKEN, CHRISTINA LEIGH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2014
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2011
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2010
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2010
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCCRACKEN, CHRISTINA LEIGH Person Filing - SIEMENS CORPORATION (INCORRESTLY SUED AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO NEI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2009
  • AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ROBBINS, LAUREN MILLER Person Filing - UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2008
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2006
  • AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MONTGOMERY, PAMELA W. Person Filing - MONTELLO INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2006
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WILLINGHAM, R. MARK Person Filing - PEERLESS INDUSTRIES INC (INCORRECTLY SUED AS PEERLESS HEATER COMPANY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2005
  • SEVERANCE : Filing Attorney - PALAZZO, JOY ELIZABETH Person Filing - WILDER, ISAAC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AMOCO OIL COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where AJAX BOILER AND HEATER COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where AJAX BOILER INC. is a litigant