This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/22/2022 at 23:43:53 (UTC).

WIGGLE INVESTMENTS AND MANAGEMENT LLC vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 WIGGLE INVESTMENTS AND MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOT DOLLINGER. The case status is Pending - Trial.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2281

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

SCOT DOLLINGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WIGGLE INVESTMENTS AND MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendant

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Other

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ROLAND

13013 Northwest Freeway

Houston, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VECERA, BRYAN

Defendant Attorney

MCCOSLIN, JOSEPH RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Original Petition

01/13/2022: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Exhibit A-01

01/13/2022: Exhibit A-01

Request for Issuance of Service

01/13/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

DOCKET CONTROL ORDER

03/11/2022: DOCKET CONTROL ORDER

Defendant's Original Answer and Initial Disclosure (44)

02/03/2022: Defendant's Original Answer and Initial Disclosure (44)

Citation Return of Service

01/24/2022: Citation Return of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • HearingCourt: 189; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCCOSLIN, JOSEPH RICHARD; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ROLAND; Issued: 1/14/2022; Served: 1/20/2022; Tracking: 73961353; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: VECERA, BRYAN; Person Filing: WIGGLE INVESTMENTS AND MANAGEMENT LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCOSLIN, JOSEPH RICHARD