Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/05/2021 at 07:44:02 (UTC).

WIENS, MARY vs. TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 WIENS, MARY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTINE WEEMS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4539

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTINE WEEMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WIENS, MARY

BURGESS, JULIE

BURGESS, BRIAN

MCCREARY, JAMES

HIRSCH, FLORENCIA

WIENS, STEVEN

VAUGHN, ALEXANDRA

HIRSCH, CONRAD

MCCREARY, NAN

Others and Defendants

TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT

211 East 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

211 East 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

AUTO CLUB COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

211 East 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

SNELL, RYAN MICHAEL

Houston, TX 77074

COLONIAL COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

211 East 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FLETCHER, CHRISTOPHER KEITH

Defendant Attorney

RUSTAM, WILLIAM R

 

Court Documents

Return of Service

03/23/2021: Return of Service

Affidavit of Service

03/24/2021: Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service

03/24/2021: Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service

03/24/2021: Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service

03/24/2021: Affidavit of Service

DEFENDANT AUTO CLUB COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S ORIGINAL ANSWER

04/01/2021: DEFENDANT AUTO CLUB COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S ORIGINAL ANSWER

FILING LETTER

03/12/2021: FILING LETTER

Exhibit

03/12/2021: Exhibit

CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST

03/12/2021: CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

03/12/2021: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RUSTAM, WILLIAM R; Person Filing: AUTO CLUB COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: COLONIAL COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Issued: 3/16/2021; Served: 3/19/2021; Tracking: 73850674; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY; Issued: 3/16/2021; Served: 3/19/2021; Tracking: 73850665; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY; Issued: 3/16/2021; Served: 3/19/2021; Tracking: 73850665; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: AUTO CLUB COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Issued: 3/16/2021; Served: 3/19/2021; Tracking: 73850660; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: AUTO CLUB COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Issued: 3/16/2021; Served: 3/19/2021; Tracking: 73850660; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: AUTO CLUB COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Issued: 3/16/2021; Served: 3/19/2021; Tracking: 73850660; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT; Issued: 3/16/2021; Served: 3/19/2021; Tracking: 73850658; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SNELL, RYAN MICHAEL; Issued: 3/16/2021; Served: 3/20/2021; Tracking: 73850651; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FLETCHER, CHRISTOPHER KEITH; Person Filing: BURGESS, JULIE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FLETCHER, CHRISTOPHER KEITH; Person Filing: BURGESS, BRIAN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FLETCHER, CHRISTOPHER KEITH; Person Filing: HIRSCH, CONRAD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FLETCHER, CHRISTOPHER KEITH; Person Filing: MCCREARY, JAMES;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FLETCHER, CHRISTOPHER KEITH; Person Filing: HIRSCH, FLORENCIA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FLETCHER, CHRISTOPHER KEITH; Person Filing: MCCREARY, NAN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FLETCHER, CHRISTOPHER KEITH; Person Filing: WIENS, STEVEN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FLETCHER, CHRISTOPHER KEITH; Person Filing: WIENS, MARY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FLETCHER, CHRISTOPHER KEITH; Person Filing: VAUGHN, ALEXANDRA;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Auto Club County Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where COLONIAL COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant