Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/16/2015 at 01:23:15 (UTC).

WHITLEY, WILLIE vs. AMERICAL OPTICAL CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/04/2005 WHITLEY, WILLIE filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against AMERICAL OPTICAL CORPORATION. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7993

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

SAMMONS BW INC (FKA BRIGGS-WEAVER INC)

BRIGGS-WAVER INC

WGM SAFETY CORPORATION

WILLSON SAFETY PRODUCTS

EMPIRE ABRASIVE EQUIPMENT CORPORATION

FLEXO PRODUCTS INC

GLENDALE PROTECTIVE TECHNOLOGIES INC

KELCO SALES & ENGINEERING COMPANY (AKA POLLEY INC)

LONE STAR INDUSTRIES INC

PAULI & GRIFFIN COMPANY

PULMOSAN SAFETY EQUIPMENT CORPORATION

SPECIALTY SAND COMPANY

TRUMANS INC

ENCON SAFETY PRODUCTS INC (FKA ENCON MANUFACTURING CO)

ENCON MANUFACTURING CO

BACOY-DALLOZ SAFETY INC (FKA DALLOZ SAFETY INC FKA WGM SAFETY

DALLOZ SAFETY INC

SCOTT TECHNOLOGIES INC

WHITLEY, WILLIE

ADAMS, CURLEY J

55 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

PAPPAS, GEORGE P.

MANNING, JACK B.

WARE, JAMES L.

PHILLIPS, CLINTON EUGENE

BEASON, RYAN A.

KACAL, GEORGE JEROME JR.

GEER, EVA D.

ROYAL, MICHAEL PATRICK

COFFEY, WILLIAM B. JR.

WELLS, PETER BOYD III

DAWSON, CARL RAPIER

BLACK, JOHN MILTON

OXFORD, HUBERT III

Other Attorneys

POWERS, JAMES H.

FULTZ, JEFFREY PIERCE

LEWIS, MARK E.

CARRINGTON, MORRIS C.

LAYMAN, DAVID M.

TAYLOR, THOMAS B.

PARSONS, JOHN PHILIP

12 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2015
  • DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • PARTIAL DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION-SILICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • PARTIAL DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION-SILICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • PARTIAL DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION-SILICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • PARTIAL DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION-SILICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2011
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2010
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
94 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - PAPPAS, GEORGE P. Person Filing - BRIGGS-WAVER INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ROSE, ROBERT J. SR. Person Filing - SOUTHERN SILICA OF LOUISIANA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2005
  • MOTION TRANSFER VENUE : Filing Attorney - OXFORD, HUBERT III Person Filing - AIR LIQUIDE AMERICA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - DAVIS, DOUGLAS WHITFIELD Person Filing - PARMELEE INDUSTRIES INC (AKA U S SAFETY PRODUCTS INC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BLACK, JOHN MILTON Person Filing - HERRON, GORDON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BLACK, JOHN MILTON Person Filing - MINARD, FRANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BLACK, JOHN MILTON Person Filing - ADAMS, CURLEY J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BLACK, JOHN MILTON Person Filing - WHITLEY, WILLIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BLACK, JOHN MILTON Person Filing - CALDERON, JUAN JOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BLACK, JOHN MILTON Person Filing - GRIGGS, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Briggs-Weaver Company is a litigant

Latest cases where TRUMANS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SAMMONS BW INC (FKA BRIGGS-WEAVER INC_) is a litigant