This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 12:06:57 (UTC).

WETZEL, JOANN (IND AND AS PERSONAL REPRE vs. A W CHESTERTON CO

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 WETZEL, JOANN IND AND AS PERSONAL REPRE filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON CO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7541

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

WETZEL, JOANN (IND AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE HEIRS AND

WETZLE, JO ANNA ELAINE (DAUGHTER OF DECEDENT JOSEPH HENRY DYKE)

DYKE, KENNETH LEON (SON OF DECEDENT JOSEPH HENRY DYKE)

PETTYJOHN, HERMAN LEE

PETTYJOHN, BRENDA ANN

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY CO INC

ASARCO INCORPORATED

GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

A W CHESTERTON CO

AMERICAN STANDARD INC

AQUA-CHEM INC (DBA CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION) (CORPORATION)

CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION

BABCOCK BORSIG POWER INC (FKA D B RILEY INC FKA RILEY STOKER

D B RILEY INC

RILEY STOKER CORPORATION

BUFFALO PUMPS INC (CORPORATION)

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

67 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

WATHEN, FRANK J. II

STUART, KIMBERLY ROSE

WADE, TODD N.

RHODES, KENNETH D.

GIBSON, SHANNON GAYLE

LACKEY, DOUG

GALLAGHER, KEVIN PATRICK

BAILEY, MELVIN DAVID

HUEBER, SUSAN JAN

OLD, JAMES ROWLAND JR.

WHITE, CLAY M.

POWERS, JAMES H.

Other Attorneys

LOWERY, JAMES A. III

SMITH, MICHELE YENNIE

FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM

OLIVER, DAVID ARTHUR JR.

PRAZAK, JONATHAN R

FRASE, LAURA ANN

JUDIN, JENNIFER

MOIR, PETER A.

20 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2014
  • PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • PARTIAL REMOVAL TO BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PARTIAL REMOVAL TO BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • MOTION TO REMOVE TRIAL READY STATUS GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2009
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2008
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2004
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWELL, LISA A. Person Filing - ABLE SUPPLY CO (CORPORATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SMITH, J. MARK Person Filing - DYKE, KENNETH LEON (SON OF DECEDENT JOSEPH HENRY DYKE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SMITH, J. MARK Person Filing - JONES, RAMONA (IND AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE HEIRS AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SMITH, J. MARK Person Filing - PETTYJOHN, HERMAN LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SMITH, J. MARK Person Filing - WETZLE, JO ANNA ELAINE (DAUGHTER OF DECEDENT JOSEPH HENRY DYKE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SMITH, J. MARK Person Filing - PETTYJOHN, BRENDA ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SMITH, J. MARK Person Filing - WETZEL, JOANN (IND AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE HEIRS AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BOUNDS, DIANE K. Person Filing - RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION (FKA GLEN ALDEN CORPORATION)

    Read MoreRead Less