Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:36:42 (UTC).

WESTPARK VILLAGE MAINTENANCE FUND INC vs. REYES, MODESTA

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 WESTPARK VILLAGE MAINTENANCE FUND INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against REYES, MODESTA. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9451

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTPARK VILLAGE MAINTENANCE FUND INC

Defendant

REYES, MODESTA

Houston, TX 77082

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NORTH, ROBERT VERNE

NORTH, ROBERT V

 

Court Documents

Citation Return

04/27/2020: Citation Return

Request for Issuance of Service

03/26/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Civil Case Information Sheet

03/26/2020: Civil Case Information Sheet

Plaintiff's Original Petition

03/26/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: REYES, MODESTA; Issued: 3/27/2020; Served: 4/14/2020; Tracking: 73738590; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: NORTH, ROBERT V; Person Filing: WESTPARK VILLAGE MAINTENANCE FUND INC;

    Read MoreRead Less