Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 12/11/2020 at 07:49:29 (UTC).

WESTERN MOTORCOACH INC vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 WESTERN MOTORCOACH INC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is R. K. SANDILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4145

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

R. K. SANDILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTERN MOTORCOACH INC

Defendant

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Other

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED THROUGH

Houston, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOUSAVIDIN, MEHDI

Defendant Attorney

BROWN, EMILY

 

Court Documents

Citation (Harris County Appraisal District)

12/02/2020: Citation (Harris County Appraisal District)

Defendant's Original Answer and Request for Disclosure

12/10/2020: Defendant's Original Answer and Request for Disclosure

Exhibit B

11/17/2020: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

11/17/2020: Exhibit A

Plaintiff's Original Petition for Review of Appraisal Review Board's Order

11/17/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition for Review of Appraisal Review Board's Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BROWN, EMILY; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED THROUGH; Issued: 11/18/2020; Served: 11/23/2020; Tracking: 73812174; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MOUSAVIDIN, MEHDI; Person Filing: WESTERN MOTORCOACH INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN, EMILY