This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:25:25 (UTC).

WEST BEND COMMUNITY IMPROVEMENT ASSOCIATION INC vs. CHAVEZ GARCIA, MARVIN A

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 WEST BEND COMMUNITY IMPROVEMENT ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CHAVEZ GARCIA, MARVIN A. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL GOMEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1505

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL GOMEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEST BEND COMMUNITY IMPROVEMENT ASSOCIATION INC

Defendant

CHAVEZ GARCIA, MARVIN A

Houston, TX 77082

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MADDOX, MARGARET ROSE

 

Court Documents

Return of Service

06/01/2020: Return of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/26/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Exhibit F

05/26/2020: Exhibit F

Exhibit E

05/26/2020: Exhibit E

Exhibit D

05/26/2020: Exhibit D

Exhibit C

05/26/2020: Exhibit C

Exhibit B

05/26/2020: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

05/26/2020: Exhibit A

Plaintiff's Original Petition and Discovery

05/26/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition and Discovery

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CHAVEZ GARCIA, MARVIN A; Issued: 5/27/2020; Served: 5/30/2020; Tracking: 73752840; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MADDOX, MARGARET ROSE; Person Filing: WEST BEND COMMUNITY IMPROVEMENT ASSOCIATION INC;

    Read MoreRead Less