This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:16:53 (UTC).

WEST AIRPORT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC vs. OKOROCHA, MATHEW U

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 WEST AIRPORT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against OKOROCHA, MATHEW U. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0665

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEST AIRPORT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants

OKOROCHA, MATHEW U

OKOROCHA, ROSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DURRETT, J. BRANTLEY III

Defendant Attorney

LAWAL, OMOTAYO J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2006
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2006
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2006
  • EVIDENCE PRESENTED-NON JURY (EACH DAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2006
  • JUDGMENT RENDERED BY COURT AFTER TRIAL (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2006
  • SETTLED/NON-SUITED (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2006
  • TO TRIAL ON MERITS (NON JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2006
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LAWAL, OMOTAYO J. Person Filing - OKOROCHA, ROSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LAWAL, OMOTAYO J. Person Filing - OKOROCHA, MATHEW U

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - DURRETT, J. BRANTLEY III Person Filing - WEST AIRPORT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less