This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:15:46 (UTC).

WEST AIRPORT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC vs. OBOT, ASUQUO

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 WEST AIRPORT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against OBOT, ASUQUO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0659

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEST AIRPORT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Defendant

OBOT, ASUQUO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DURRETT, J. BRANTLEY III

Defendant Attorney

EHEMAN, MICHAEL W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2005
  • DEFENDANT COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2005
  • FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2005
  • JUDGMENT RENDERED BY COURT AFTER TRIAL (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2005
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2005
  • TO TRIAL ON MERITS (NON JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2005
  • EVIDENCE PRESENTED-NON JURY (EACH DAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - DURRETT, J. BRANTLEY III Person Filing - WEST AIRPORT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - EHEMAN, MICHAEL W. Person Filing - OBOT, ASUQUO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - DURRETT, J. BRANTLEY III Person Filing - WEST AIRPORT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less