This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:17:03 (UTC).

WEST AIRPORT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC vs. IKWUEZUNMA, ALOYSIUS I

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 WEST AIRPORT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against IKWUEZUNMA, ALOYSIUS I. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0666

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEST AIRPORT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Defendant

IKWUEZUNMA, ALOYSIUS I

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DURRETT, J. BRANTLEY III

Defendant Attorney

UGBANA, MATTHEW C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2006
  • ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED DENYING MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2006
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2006
  • EVIDENCE PRESENTED-NON JURY (EACH DAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2006
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2006
  • JUDGMENT RENDERED BY COURT AFTER TRIAL (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2006
  • TO TRIAL ON MERITS (NON JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2006
  • DEFENDANT COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2005
  • ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ANSWER : Filing Attorney - UGBANA, MATTHEW C. Person Filing - IKWUEZUNMA, ALOYSIUS I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - DURRETT, J. BRANTLEY III Person Filing - WEST AIRPORT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - DURRETT, J. BRANTLEY III Person Filing - WEST AIRPORT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less