This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:17:13 (UTC).

WEST AIRPORT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC vs. CHARLES, DORCAS

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 WEST AIRPORT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CHARLES, DORCAS. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0667

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEST AIRPORT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Defendant

CHARLES, DORCAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DURRETT, J. BRANTLEY III

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2005
  • DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - DURRETT, J. BRANTLEY III Person Filing - WEST AIRPORT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less