This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/01/2020 at 07:58:35 (UTC).

WELLS, STEPHEN C (DR) vs. AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/08/2020 WELLS, STEPHEN C DR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RABEEA COLLIER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4222

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RABEEA COLLIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS, STEPHEN C (DR)

Defendant

AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Other

AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY BY SERVING THE TEXAS COMMISSIONER

100 Amica Way

Lincoln, RI 02865

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIRK, DANA GARETH

Defendant Attorney

MCCLUGGAGE, ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Citation (Amica Mutual Insurance Company)

10/20/2020: Citation (Amica Mutual Insurance Company)

Defendant Amica Mutual Insurance Company's Original Answer

10/26/2020: Defendant Amica Mutual Insurance Company's Original Answer

Request for Issuance of Service

10/08/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Civil case information sheet

10/08/2020: Civil case information sheet

Plaintiff's original petition for declaratory judgment

10/08/2020: Plaintiff's original petition for declaratory judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCCLUGGAGE, ANDREW J.; Person Filing: AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (INSURANCE COMMISSION); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY BY SERVING THE TEXAS COMMISSIONER; Issued: 10/9/2020; Served: 10/14/2020; Tracking: 73799158; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: KIRK, DANA GARETH; Person Filing: WELLS, STEPHEN C (DR);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amica Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCLUGGAGE, ANDREW