This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/16/2020 at 07:31:01 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA vs. GOR, LAVINIA J

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GOR, LAVINIA J. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KYLE CARTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8875

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KYLE CARTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendant

GOR, LAVINIA J

Houston, TX 77034

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ABBOTT, WHITNEY

Defendant Attorney

JOHNSON, JONATHON CHADWICK

 

Court Documents

Service Return

09/30/2020: Service Return

Filing Letter

10/02/2020: Filing Letter

Defendant Original Answer and Requests for Disclosures to the Plaintiff

10/02/2020: Defendant Original Answer and Requests for Disclosures to the Plaintiff

Cover letter

09/22/2020: Cover letter

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

09/22/2020: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: JOHNSON, JONATHON CHADWICK; Person Filing: GOR, LAVINIA J;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GOR, LAVINIA J; Issued: 9/23/2020; Served: 9/28/2020; Received: 10/1/2020; Tracking: 73791098; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ABBOTT, WHITNEY; Person Filing: WELLS FARGO BANK NA;

    Read MoreRead Less