This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 12:09:53 (UTC).

WELLBORN TIRE COMPANY INC vs. JONES, BRIAN

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 WELLBORN TIRE COMPANY INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JONES, BRIAN. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7562

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLBORN TIRE COMPANY INC

Defendants

JONES, BRIAN

JONES, DARLENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOSTECNIK, DORA ANN

Defendant Attorney

LAMBERT, LINDSAY LEE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2005
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2005
  • ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2005
  • BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS, CASE ON HOLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • REMOVED FROM BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LAMBERT, LINDSAY LEE Person Filing - JONES, DARLENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LAMBERT, LINDSAY LEE Person Filing - BAY TIRE & AUTOMOTIVE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2004
  • BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS, CASE ON HOLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LAMBERT, LINDSAY LEE Person Filing - JONES, BRIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GOSTECNIK, DORA ANN Person Filing - WELLBORN TIRE COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less