This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:34:24 (UTC).

WELDON, REESE vs. HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY OFFICE

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 WELDON, REESE filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY OFFICE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is R. K. SANDILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1654

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

R. K. SANDILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELDON, REESE

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY JP PRECINCT 5 PLACE 2

16715 Clay Road

Houston, TX 77084

TEXAS DEPT OF PUBLIC SAFETY - CRIME RECORDS SERVICE

Others

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING SCOTT A DURFEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PERRY, JAMES REID II

16206 Cooper Lak

Cypress, TX 77433

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • HearingCourt: 127; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION; Requesting Party: PERRY, JAMES REID II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ASSIGNED TO CLERK/NOT ISSUED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING SCOTT A DURFEE; Tracking: 73755154; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ASSIGNED TO CLERK/NOT ISSUED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Tracking: 73755153; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ASSIGNED TO CLERK/NOT ISSUED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY JP PRECINCT 5 PLACE 2; Tracking: 73755151; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY JP PRECINCT 5 PLACE 2; Issued: 6/3/2020; Tracking: 73755127; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING SCOTT A DURFEE; Issued: 6/3/2020; Tracking: 73754631; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 6/3/2020; Tracking: 73754630; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 5/27/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PERRY, JAMES REID II; Person Filing: WELDON, REESE;

    Read MoreRead Less