This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:43:31 (UTC).

WELCH, ROBERT CHARLES vs. A W CHESTERTON CO

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 WELCH, ROBERT CHARLES filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON CO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1275

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WELCH, ROBERT CHARLES

WELCH, MARYETTA

WELCH, MARYETTA (IND AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE HERIS AND

WELCH, JERRY (SON OF DECEDENT ROBERT CHARLES WELCH)

MONEER, SHARON (DAUGHTER OF DECEDENT ROBERT CHARLES WELCH

MATYAS, MARY (DAUGHTER OF DECEDENT ROBERT CHARLES WELCH)

WELCH, LARRY (SON OF DECEDENT

ALLEN, DEBBIE (DAUGHTER OF DECEDENT ROBERT CHARLES WELCH)

Defendants

A W CHESTERTON CO

AMERICAN STANDARD INC

AQUA CHEM INC

BABCOCK BORSIG POWER INC

CERTAINTEED CORP

CRANE CORP

CROWN CORK & SEAL CO INC

DANA CORP

DURABLA MANUFACTURING CO

FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORP

GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES LLC

GEORGIA PACIFIC CORP

25 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REAGIN, HILARY GLASSMAN

Defendant Attorneys

HUEBER, SUSAN JAN

WHITE, CLAY M.

HAMILTON, PAUL EDWARD

ELLISTON, GARY D.

LOWERY, JAMES A. III

FOLEY, JAMES THOMAS III

HARDING, LISA D.

LYNN, LAWRENCE A.

TOMASINO, JUAN CARLOS

BAILEY, MELVIN DAVID

Other Attorneys

OLIVER, DAVID ARTHUR JR.

FULLER, L. HAYES III

FARRELL, WILLIAM HOWARD

PRAZAK, JONATHAN R

FRASE, LAURA ANN

JUDIN, JENNIFER

WADE, TODD N.

RHODES, KENNETH D.

IRVIN, JASON JAMES

6 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2013
  • PARTIAL REMOVAL TO BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2011
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2011
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2008
  • ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WILKINSON, ROBERT W Person Filing - GAURDLINE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2007
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2006
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ELLISTON, GARY D. Person Filing - UNION CARBIDE CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2006
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KENNEDY, NICOLE BROWN Person Filing - ALLEN, DEBBIE (DAUGHTER OF DECEDENT ROBERT CHARLES WELCH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2006
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KENNEDY, NICOLE BROWN Person Filing - MONEER, SHARON (DAUGHTER OF DECEDENT ROBERT CHARLES WELCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2006
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KENNEDY, NICOLE BROWN Person Filing - WELCH, JERRY (SON OF DECEDENT ROBERT CHARLES WELCH)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KNOCKAERT, ERIK ANDREW Person Filing - GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - JUDIN, JENNIFER Person Filing - KAISER GYPSUM CO INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MOIR, PETER A. Person Filing - OWENS ILLINOIS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LYNN, LAWRENCE A. Person Filing - FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BAILEY, MELVIN DAVID Person Filing - GEORGIA PACIFIC CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM Person Filing - GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FRASE, LAURA ANN Person Filing - INGERSOLL RAND CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - JACKSON, JESSICA S. Person Filing - A W CHESTERTON CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KENNEDY, NICOLE BROWN Person Filing - WELCH, ROBERT CHARLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KENNEDY, NICOLE BROWN Person Filing - WELCH, MARYETTA

    Read MoreRead Less