Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 20:21:22 (UTC).

WEBER, DONALD GEORGE vs. UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION (IND AND DBA UNION CARBI

Case Summary

On 05/05/2005 WEBER, DONALD GEORGE filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION IND AND DBA UNION CARBI. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0498

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

WEBER, DONALD GEORGE

GENERAL ELECTRIC CO

GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION (IND AND DBA UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND

UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS INC

A M F INCORPORATED

AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION

AMETEK INC

AQUA-CHEM INC (INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION)

CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION

BABCOCK BORSIG POWER INC (FKA DB RILEY INC FKA RILEY STOKER

DB RILEY INC

RILEY STOKER CORPORATION

BECHTEL CORP (FKA BECHTEL CIVIL & MINERALS FKA BECHTEL CIVIC INC)

BECHTEL CIVIL & MINERALS INC

BECHTEL CIVIL INC

BECHTEL POWER CORPORATION

BECHTEL GROUP INC

48 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

PARTIDA-KIPNESS, ROBBIE S.

ANDREWS, PATRICIA KAY

WADE, TODD N.

RHODES, KENNETH D.

GALLAGHER, KEVIN PATRICK

LEVINE, TORI SMITH

ELLISTON, GARY D.

WHITE, CLAY M.

STEVENS, RAYMOND LYN

Other Attorneys

POWERS, JAMES H.

LOWERY, JAMES A. III

ADAMS, ROBERT L.

PAPPAS, GEORGE P.

ADAMS, KENT M.

WILSON, JACKSON D. II

FUNDERBURK, LARRY B.

BARRON, BARBARA JANE

SHEEHY, RICHARD A.

SMITH, JAMES DAVID

BASHLINE, JAMES DUANE

1 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2015
  • ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2010
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PAPPAS, GEORGE P. Person Filing - FBCO INC (FKA NATKIN SERVICE CO FKA NATKIN SERVICE CO OF KANSAS CITY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PAPPAS, GEORGE P. Person Filing - NATKIN SERVICE CO OF KANSAS CITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWERS, JAMES H. Person Filing - RANSBURG CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWERS, JAMES H. Person Filing - AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION (IMPROPERLY SUED AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWERS, JAMES H. Person Filing - DEVILBISS INDUSTRIAL PRODUCTS CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWERS, JAMES H. Person Filing - DANA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LEVINE, TORI SMITH Person Filing - AMF INCORPORATED (INCORRECTLY SUED HEREIN AS A M F INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LEVINE, TORI SMITH Person Filing - B&B ENGINEERING & SUPPLY CO INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WADE, TODD N. Person Filing - KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LEVINE, TORI SMITH Person Filing - A M F INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - WADE, TODD N. Person Filing - KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SHEEHY, RICHARD A. Person Filing - TH AGRICULTURE & NUTRITION LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SMITH, JAMES DAVID Person Filing - PARSONS ENEGRY & CHEMICALS GROUP INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWERS, JAMES H. Person Filing - UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION (INDIVIDUALLY AND FKA UNION CARBIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWERS, JAMES H. Person Filing - UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PARTIDA-KIPNESS, ROBBIE S. Person Filing - WEBER, DONALD GEORGE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BECHTEL POWER CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BECHTEL GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BECHTEL CIVIL & MINERALS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where AMF INC is a litigant