This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/18/2022 at 07:19:09 (UTC).

WDL LLC vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 WDL LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE H PALMER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7795

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE H PALMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WDL LLC

Defendant

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Other

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS

Houston, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HILL, J. MARCUS

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Original Petition

06/24/2022: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Exhibit A

06/24/2022: Exhibit A

Request for Issuance of Service

06/24/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Citation/Return of Service

07/11/2022: Citation/Return of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS; Issued: 6/24/2022; Served: 7/7/2022; Returned: 7/8/2022; Tracking: 74019895; Deliver To: CONST 1 ALAN ROSEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HILL, J. MARCUS; Person Filing: WDL LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HILL, J. MARCUS