This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:06:13 (UTC).

WATSON, ROBERT LEE JR vs. EVANS-WATSON, SHARON

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 WATSON, ROBERT LEE JR filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against EVANS-WATSON, SHARON. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0373

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WATSON, ROBERT LEE JR

WATSON, SHARON EVANS

Defendants

EVANS-WATSON, SHARON

WATSON, ROBERT LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BASTINE, VOLLY C. JR.

MCWHERTER, LOUIS ALFRED

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2005
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF WAIVER ORDER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2005
  • FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED CHANGING NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2005
  • WAIVER CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2005
  • COUNTER CLAIM : Filing Attorney - MCWHERTER, LOUIS ALFRED Person Filing - WATSON, SHARON EVANS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BASTINE, VOLLY C. JR. Person Filing - WATSON, ROBERT LEE JR

    Read MoreRead Less