This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/29/2021 at 11:19:31 (UTC).

WATKINS, MONTIE vs. TRANSOCEAN OFFSHORE DEEPWATER DRILLING INC

Case Summary

On 04/26/2021 WATKINS, MONTIE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TRANSOCEAN OFFSHORE DEEPWATER DRILLING INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is TANYA GARRISON. The case status is Pending - Trial.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4686

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

TANYA GARRISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WATKINS, MONTIE

Defendants

TRANSOCEAN OFFSHORE DEEPWATER DRILLING INC

TRITON VOYAGER ASSET LEASING GMBH

TRITON VOYAGER ASSET LEASING GMBH ASGARD US

BOE EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARNOLD, KURT BRYNILDE

Defendant Attorneys

CRAWFORD, TODD GREGORY

MOUTON, CHARLES A.

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

04/26/2021: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

ORDER GRANTING APPEARANCE PRO HAC VICE SIGNED

10/25/2021: ORDER GRANTING APPEARANCE PRO HAC VICE SIGNED

Proposed Order

10/06/2021: Proposed Order

Notice of Submission

10/06/2021: Notice of Submission

Exhibit C

10/06/2021: Exhibit C

Exhibit B

10/06/2021: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

10/06/2021: Exhibit A

Motion and Order for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice

10/06/2021: Motion and Order for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice

Defendants Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc, Triton Voyager Asset Leasing GmbH and Triton Voyager Asset Leasing GmbH, Asgard US's Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition 5.21.21(4827795.1)

05/21/2021: Defendants Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc, Triton Voyager Asset Leasing GmbH and Triton Voyager Asset Leasing GmbH, Asgard US's Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition 5.21.21(4827795.1)

Defendant Boe Exploration & Production LLC First Amended Answer to Plantiff's Original Petition

06/07/2021: Defendant Boe Exploration & Production LLC First Amended Answer to Plantiff's Original Petition

DOCKET CONTROL ORDER-JCVO02

06/25/2021: DOCKET CONTROL ORDER-JCVO02

Ex. 2

07/15/2021: Ex. 2

Ex. 1

07/15/2021: Ex. 1

Plaintiff's Partially Opposed Motion for Preferential Trial Setting

07/15/2021: Plaintiff's Partially Opposed Motion for Preferential Trial Setting

Exhibit A

07/20/2021: Exhibit A

Certificate of Written Discovery

07/20/2021: Certificate of Written Discovery

Exhibit A

07/21/2021: Exhibit A

Joint Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Preferential Trial Setting

07/21/2021: Joint Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Preferential Trial Setting

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • HearingCourt: 157; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER GRANTING APPEARANCE PRO HAC VICE SIGNED; Order Signed: 10/25/2021;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • HearingCourt: 157; Docket Type: Submission Docket (Local Rule 12); Reason: LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE (MOTION FOR); Requesting Party: CRAWFORD, TODD GREGORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • HearingCourt: 157; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: PREFERENTIAL SETTING (MOTION FOR); Requesting Party: CHRISTENSEN, ROLAND THOMAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MOUTON, CHARLES A.; Person Filing: BOE EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CRAWFORD, TODD GREGORY; Person Filing: TRANSOCEAN OFFSHORE DEEPWATER DRILLING INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CRAWFORD, TODD GREGORY; Person Filing: TRITON VOYAGER ASSET LEASING GMBH ASGARD US;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CRAWFORD, TODD GREGORY; Person Filing: TRITON VOYAGER ASSET LEASING GMBH;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MOUTON, CHARLES A.; Person Filing: BOE EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ARNOLD, KURT BRYNILDE; Person Filing: WATKINS, MONTIE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOE EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRAWFORD, TODD GREGORY