This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/07/2022 at 13:01:21 (UTC).

WALTER, SHELLEY vs. HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

Case Summary

On 01/25/2022 WALTER, SHELLEY filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is TANYA GARRISON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4656

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

TANYA GARRISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALTER, SHELLEY

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

JERSEY VILLAGE POLICE DEPARTMENT

16401 Lakeview Dr., Jersey

Village, TX 77040

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

Others

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE SERVING BRIAN ROSE

1310 Prairie 5Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES SERVING KELVIN BANKS

102 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker Street

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SARDARI, YASHA

Defendant Attorney

ROSE, BRIAN LYNN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • HearingCourt: 157; Docket Type: Another Docket; Reason: COORDINATORS REMINDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • HearingCourt: 157; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR); Results: Passed; Comments: PER Y. SARDARI VIA PHONE 2/23/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ROSE, BRIAN LYNN; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: JERSEY VILLAGE POLICE DEPARTMENT; Issued: 1/31/2022; Served: 2/7/2022; Tracking: 73967108; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 1/31/2022; Tracking: 73964270; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES SERVING KELVIN BANKS; Issued: 1/31/2022; Tracking: 73964268; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 1/31/2022; Tracking: 73964267; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE SERVING BRIAN ROSE; Issued: 1/31/2022; Tracking: 73964266; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 1/31/2022; Tracking: 73964265; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SARDARI, YASHA; Person Filing: WALTER, SHELLEY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 1/25/2022;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE SERVING BRIAN ROSE is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES is a litigant