This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 08/14/2022 at 06:33:31 (UTC).

WALSTON, TERI (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PERSONAL REPRES vs. ARAMIS INC (AND ITS LEN-RON MANUFACTURING DIVISION

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 WALSTON, TERI INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PERSONAL REPRES filed an Other lawsuit against ARAMIS INC AND ITS LEN-RON MANUFACTURING DIVISION. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL GOMEZ and KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6187

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

MICHAEL GOMEZ

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

W, JWP (MINOR)

WALSTON, TERI (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE

WALSTON, RACHEL

Defendants and Others

BAYER CONSUMER CARE HOLDINGS LLC (FKA BAYER CONSUMER CARE LLC FKA MSD

SKUTT CERAMIC PRODUCTS, INC.

ESTE LAUDER INC A SUBSIDIARY OF THE ESTE? LAUDER COMPANIES, INC., FOR

CHARLES B. CHRYSTAL COMPANY, INC.

HIMMEL MANAGEMENT CO. LLC A/K/A HIMMEL GROUP FORMERLY D/B/A MARTIN HIM

AVON PRODUCTS INC

BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA, INC. (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-IN

SMITHKLINE BEECHAM P.L.C. (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTER

BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC (A SUBSIDIARY OF BAYER AG)

BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES, INC. F/K/A MINERAL PIGMENT SOLUTIONS, INC. (SUED

VI-JON, INC. F/K/A CUMBERLAND SWAN HOLDINGS, INC., FOR ITS WALGREENS B

BLOCK DRUG CORPORATION (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST

PFIZER INC.

GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC F/K/A SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP. (SUED INDIVIDUALLY

CYPRUS MINES CORPORATION

WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS, INC.

COLOR TECHNIQUES, INC.

80 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MONTEMAYOR, JENNIFER IVETT

WATHEN, FRANK J. II

Defendant Attorneys

EDWARDS, BRADY SHERROD

DAVIS, SARAH MARIE

Other Attorneys

WARE, JAMES L.

FRAZIER, MARY ELIZONDO

KEITH, JILLIAN VAN RENSBURG

BARRON, BARBARA JANE

SHORTALL, KYLE VINCENT

GREEN, ADAM WAGONER

DANIEL, AUSTIN COLYER

SLAUGHTER, EDWARD MORRIS

YARBROUGH, THEODORE CHRISTIAN

SMITH, SARAH R.

LOWERY, JAMES A. III

WRIGHT, DAWN MARIE

WILKES, FORREST REN

TERRY, MICHAEL G.

IRVIN, JASON

PENDROFF, BENJAMIN TODD

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Citation (Walgreens Co)

12/17/2020: Citation (Walgreens Co)

Citation (Glaxosmithkline LLC)

12/17/2020: Citation (Glaxosmithkline LLC)

Citation (Block Drug Corporation)

12/17/2020: Citation (Block Drug Corporation)

Citation (Block Drug Company Inc)

12/17/2020: Citation (Block Drug Company Inc)

Citation (Bayer Healthcare LLC)

12/17/2020: Citation (Bayer Healthcare LLC)

Citation (Aramis Inc)

12/17/2020: Citation (Aramis Inc)

Citation (Wyeth Holdings LLC)

12/17/2020: Citation (Wyeth Holdings LLC)

Citation (Union Carbide Corporation)

12/17/2020: Citation (Union Carbide Corporation)

Citation (Specialty Minerals Inc)

12/17/2020: Citation (Specialty Minerals Inc)

Citation (Pfizer Inc)

12/17/2020: Citation (Pfizer Inc)

Citation (Ford Motor Company)

12/17/2020: Citation (Ford Motor Company)

Citation (Barretts Minerals Inc)

12/17/2020: Citation (Barretts Minerals Inc)

Citation (Whittaker Clark & Daniels Inc)

12/17/2020: Citation (Whittaker Clark & Daniels Inc)

Citation (Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc)

12/17/2020: Citation (Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc)

Citation (Vi-Jon Inc)

12/17/2020: Citation (Vi-Jon Inc)

Citation (The Procter & Gamble Company)

12/17/2020: Citation (The Procter & Gamble Company)

Citation (Smithklie Beecham PLC)

12/17/2020: Citation (Smithklie Beecham PLC)

Citation (Skutt Ceramic Products Inc)

12/17/2020: Citation (Skutt Ceramic Products Inc)

181 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON MINOR SETTLEMENT SIGNED; Order Signed: 2/11/2022;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • HearingCourt: 888; Docket Type: Trial Motion Docket - Rule 13 Asbestosis; Reason: DISMISS (MOTION TO); Results: Passed; Requesting Party: SLAUGHTER, EDWARD MORRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162); Order Signed: 1/6/2022;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • HearingCourt: 888; Docket Type: Trial Motion Docket - Rule 13 Asbestosis; Reason: MINOR SETTLEMENT (MOTION FOR)(STATUTORY); Results: Granted; Comments: O.T.F (C.C.R LAURIE SHEARER); Requesting Party: WATHEN, FRANK J. II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD; Order Signed: 12/17/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • HearingCourt: 888; Docket Type: Trial Motion Docket - Rule 13 Asbestosis; Reason: DISMISS (MOTION TO); Results: Re-Set; Requesting Party: SLAUGHTER, EDWARD MORRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • HearingCourt: 888; Docket Type: Trial Motion Docket - Rule 13 Asbestosis; Reason: MINOR SETTLEMENT (MOTION FOR)(STATUTORY); Results: Re-Set; Requesting Party: WATHEN, FRANK J. II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • HearingCourt: 888; Docket Type: Trial Motion Docket - Rule 13 Asbestosis; Reason: MINOR SETTLEMENT (MOTION FOR)(STATUTORY); Results: Re-Set; Requesting Party: WATHEN, FRANK J. II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • HearingCourt: 888; Docket Type: Trial Motion Docket - Rule 13 Asbestosis; Reason: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MOTION FOR); Results: Hearing Held; Comments: ORDER TO FOLLOW; Requesting Party: WATHEN, FRANK J. II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • HearingCourt: 888; Docket Type: Trial Motion Docket - Rule 13 Asbestosis; Reason: SUMMARY JUDGMENT-FINAL (MOTION FOR) (TRCP 166A); Results: Passed; Comments: ANGIE 361-866-8045; Requesting Party: TERRY, MICHAEL G.

    Read MoreRead Less
95 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BARRETTS MINERALS INC MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 12/1/2020; Served: 12/11/2020; Tracking: 73815629; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ARAMIS INC (AND ITS LEN-RON MANUFACTURING DIVISION) MAY BE SERVED; Issued: 12/1/2020; Served: 12/15/2020; Tracking: 73815626; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MONTEMAYOR, JENNIFER IVETT; Person Filing: THE ESTATE OF JOHN D WALSTON (DECEASED);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MONTEMAYOR, JENNIFER IVETT; Person Filing: WALSTON, TERI (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MONTEMAYOR, JENNIFER IVETT; Person Filing: WALSTON, PHILLIP;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MONTEMAYOR, JENNIFER IVETT; Person Filing: WALSTON, JOHN (JR);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MONTEMAYOR, JENNIFER IVETT; Person Filing: WALSTON, RACHEL;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MONTEMAYOR, JENNIFER IVETT; Person Filing: W, JWP (MINOR);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MONTEMAYOR, JENNIFER IVETT; Person Filing: W, JHQ (MINOR);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AVON PRODUCTS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Vi-Jon, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SKUTT CERAMIC PRODUCTS INC. is a litigant