Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 12/31/2020 at 07:53:49 (UTC).

WALLACE, TANISHA vs. INFINITY COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/07/2020 WALLACE, TANISHA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is STEVEN KIRKLAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8330

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

STEVEN KIRKLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALLACE, TANISHA

Defendants

INFINITY COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

NGUYEN, VICTORIA

Spring, TX 77379

Other

INFINITY COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY CAN BE SERVED THROUGH

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLAZE, JORDAN A

 

Court Documents

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7017 1450 0001 3702 5409

12/15/2020: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7017 1450 0001 3702 5409

Certified Mail Receipt

12/16/2020: Certified Mail Receipt

Letter Requesting Citation

12/23/2020: Letter Requesting Citation

First Amended Petition and Request for Disclosure

12/23/2020: First Amended Petition and Request for Disclosure

Plaintiff's Original Petition, Request for Disclosure, Interrogatories and Request for Production

12/07/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition, Request for Disclosure, Interrogatories and Request for Production

Letter to Clerk

12/11/2020: Letter to Clerk

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: NGUYEN, VICTORIA; Issued: 12/29/2020; Tracking: 73826363; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: INFINITY COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY CAN BE SERVED THROUGH; Issued: 12/23/2020; Tracking: 73825356; Deliver To: CANCELLED BY ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GLAZE, JORDAN ANDREW; Person Filing: WALLACE, TANISHA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: INFINITY COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY CAN BE SERVED THROUGH; Issued: 12/15/2020; Tracking: 73821841; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GLAZE, JORDAN ANDREW; Person Filing: WALLACE, TANISHA;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Infinity County Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Glaze, Jordan Andrew