This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/15/2019 at 07:32:22 (UTC).

WALL, JAMES D vs. AMERON INTERNATIONAL COR (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST

Case Summary

On 06/21/2019 WALL, JAMES D filed an Other lawsuit against AMERON INTERNATIONAL COR INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2832

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WALL, ESTELLA

WALL, JAMES D

Defendants

HERCULES INC (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HERCULES

SAINT-COBAIN INVESTMENTS INC

ASHLAND INC (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HERCULES

VALERO ENERGY CORPORATION

EXXONMOBIL REFINING & SUPPLY

CONOCOPHILLIPS CO (F/K/A PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO) (INDIVIDUALLY AND

AMERON INTERNATIONAL COR (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST

CARRIER CORP

AMETEK INC (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HERCULES INC

CERTAINTEED (F/K/A SAINT-COBAIN INVESTMENTS INC) (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS

HERCULES LLC

EXXON CO

EXXON CORP STANDARD OIL (NEW JERSEY)

SHELL OIL CO

SID RICHARDSON CARBON & ENERGY

CHAMPLAIN CABLE CORP (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO

GUARD-LINE INC

CONOCO INC

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CABUTTO, LAURA

Defendant Attorneys

WILLIAMS, PAMELA JEAN NEALE

BURNS, DAVID W.

KUGLER, LAURA ELLIS

TEZINO, DAWN RACHELLE

BOSIO, NATHANIEL AUSTIN

 

Court Documents

Exhibit B

06/21/2019: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

06/21/2019: Exhibit A

Notice of Transfer Under Rule 13 of Tag-Along Case

06/21/2019: Notice of Transfer Under Rule 13 of Tag-Along Case

Ameron's International Corporation's Motion To Transfer Venue special Exceptions and Original Answer To Original Petition

06/25/2019: Ameron's International Corporation's Motion To Transfer Venue special Exceptions and Original Answer To Original Petition

Defendant Valero Energy Corporation Original Answer Subject to Its Motion to Transfer Venue

06/27/2019: Defendant Valero Energy Corporation Original Answer Subject to Its Motion to Transfer Venue

Defendant Valero Energy Corporation Motion to Transfer Venue

06/27/2019: Defendant Valero Energy Corporation Motion to Transfer Venue

Defendant Hercules LLC's Original Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition

07/01/2019: Defendant Hercules LLC's Original Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition

Defendant Ashland LLC's Original Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition

07/01/2019: Defendant Ashland LLC's Original Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition

Defendant Ametek, Inc.'s Original Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition

07/01/2019: Defendant Ametek, Inc.'s Original Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition

Shell Oil Company's Motion to Transfer Venue, Original Answer and Juru Demand Subject Thereto

07/01/2019: Shell Oil Company's Motion to Transfer Venue, Original Answer and Juru Demand Subject Thereto

Defendant, Guard-Line, INC'S Answer To Plaintiffs' Original Asbestos Petition and Jury Demand Texas Exposure

07/10/2019: Defendant, Guard-Line, INC'S Answer To Plaintiffs' Original Asbestos Petition and Jury Demand Texas Exposure

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BOSIO, NATHANIEL AUSTIN; Person Filing: GUARD-LINE INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WILLIAMS, PAMELA JEAN NEALE; Person Filing: AMETEK INC (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HERCULES INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: TEZINO, DAWN RACHELLE; Person Filing: SHELL OIL CO;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WILLIAMS, PAMELA JEAN NEALE; Person Filing: HERCULES LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WILLIAMS, PAMELA JEAN NEALE; Person Filing: HERCULES INC (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HERCULES;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WILLIAMS, PAMELA JEAN NEALE; Person Filing: ASHLAND INC (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HERCULES;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BURNS, DAVID W.; Person Filing: VALERO ENERGY CORPORATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Description: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Description: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: KUGLER, LAURA ELLIS; Person Filing: AMERON INTERNATIONAL COR (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CABUTTO, LAURA; Person Filing: WALL, ESTELLA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CABUTTO, LAURA; Person Filing: WALL, JAMES D;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EXXON CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Conoco, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company is a litigant

Latest cases where HERCULES INC is a litigant