This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 12:07:14 (UTC).

WACHOVIA BANK N A (AS TRUSTEE AND ITS SU vs. HERMIS, ELMIL

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 WACHOVIA BANK N A AS TRUSTEE AND ITS SU filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against HERMIS, ELMIL. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7543

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WACHOVIA BANK N A (AS TRUSTEE AND ITS SUCCESSORS OR ASSIGNS)

Defendant

HERMIS, ELMIL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRAITHWAITE, BRIDGET ANNE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2005
  • DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2005
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2005
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2004
  • TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2004
  • TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2004
  • ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BRAITHWAITE, BRIDGET ANNE Person Filing - WACHOVIA BANK N A (AS TRUSTEE AND ITS SUCCESSORS OR ASSIGNS)

    Read MoreRead Less