This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 12:09:45 (UTC).

W K FOUNTAINVIEW APARTMENTS L P vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 W K FOUNTAINVIEW APARTMENTS L P filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7561

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

W K FOUNTAINVIEW APARTMENTS L P

Defendant

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALTON, GREGORY JEROME

Defendant Attorney

WALL, KENNETH E. JR.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2005
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2005
  • SETTLEMENT ANNOUNCED NOT ON RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2005
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - DALTON, GREGORY JEROME Person Filing - W K FOUNTAINVIEW APARTMENTS L P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WALL, KENNETH E. JR. Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - DALTON, GREGORY JEROME Person Filing - W K FOUNTAINVIEW APARTMENTS L P

    Read MoreRead Less