This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/25/2021 at 07:32:44 (UTC).

VOZAR, KELLIE NICOLE vs. HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 VOZAR, KELLIE NICOLE filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT K. SCHAFFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9660

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT K. SCHAFFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VOZAR, KELLIE NICOLE

Defendants

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, CRIME RECORDS SERVICE MSC 0234

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK`S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY`S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT ATTN: EXPUNCTIONS

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION / ATTENTION: E-FILE & RE: SEARCHTX

Others

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING DEIDRE HARRIS

1200 Travis 16Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker Street

Houston, TX 77011

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L. ROSE

1310 Prairie 5Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR

102 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION (OCA EXPUNCTIONS) BY SERVING

205 W 14Th Street Suite 600

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEGRAND, LESLIE PARIS III

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • HearingCourt: 152; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION (OCA EXPUNCTIONS) BY SERVING; Issued: 7/19/2021; Tracking: 73887714; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR; Issued: 7/19/2021; Tracking: 73887713; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 7/19/2021; Tracking: 73887700; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L. ROSE; Issued: 7/19/2021; Tracking: 73887699; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 7/19/2021; Tracking: 73887698; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 7/19/2021; Tracking: 73887697; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING DEIDRE HARRIS; Issued: 7/19/2021; Tracking: 73887693; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 7/9/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LEGRAND, LESLIE PARIS III; Person Filing: VOZAR, KELLIE NICOLE;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION - LEGAL DIVISION is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE is a litigant