Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 01/02/2021 at 07:38:54 (UTC).

VISTA SUITES LLC vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 12/09/2020 VISTA SUITES LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is TANYA GARRISON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8938

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

TANYA GARRISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VISTA SUITES LLC

Defendant

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Other

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT (A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE

13013 Northwest Freeway

Houston, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOUSAVIDIN, MEHDI

Defendant Attorney

MCCOSLIN, JOSEPH R.

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT B

12/09/2020: EXHIBIT B

EXHIBIT A

12/09/2020: EXHIBIT A

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

12/09/2020: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

Citation - Return of Service

12/22/2020: Citation - Return of Service

Defendant's Original Answer and Request for Disclosure

12/29/2020: Defendant's Original Answer and Request for Disclosure

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCCOSLIN, JOSEPH R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT (A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE; Issued: 12/10/2020; Tracking: 73820271; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MOUSAVIDIN, MEHDI; Person Filing: VISTA SUITES LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCOSLIN, JOSEPH RICHARD