This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/08/2022 at 07:18:11 (UTC).

VILLARREAL, CARLOS vs. HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 VILLARREAL, CARLOS filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JACLANEL M. MCFARLAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8480

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JACLANEL M. MCFARLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VILLARREAL, CARLOS

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

OCA EXPUNCTIONS LEGAL DIVISION

HARRIS COUNTY COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS DEPARTMENT

DEER PARK POLICE DEPARTMENT

Others

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN ROSE

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN BANKS

OCA EXPUNCTIONS LEGAL DIVISION BY SERVING MARGIE JOHNSON

COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/24/2022

HearingCourt: 133; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2022

DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: DEER PARK POLICE DEPARTMENT; Issued: 9/27/2022; Tracking: 74057159; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2022

DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY; Issued: 9/27/2022; Tracking: 74051653; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2022

DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: OCA EXPUNCTIONS LEGAL DIVISION BY SERVING MARGIE JOHNSON; Issued: 9/27/2022; Tracking: 74051651; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2022

DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN BANKS; Issued: 9/27/2022; Tracking: 74051649; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2022

DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 9/27/2022; Tracking: 74051647; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2022

DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 9/27/2022; Tracking: 74051644; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2022

DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN ROSE; Issued: 9/27/2022; Tracking: 74051643; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2022

DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 9/27/2022; Tracking: 74051640; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2022

DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 9/19/2022;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2022

DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: VILLARREAL, CARLOS;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less