This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 01/02/2017 at 20:23:15 (UTC).

VICTORIAN, JOSSLYN (AS NEXT FRIEND OF JA vs. TIDAL POWER SERVICES LLC

Case Summary

On 04/12/2016 VICTORIAN, JOSSLYN AS NEXT FRIEND OF JA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TIDAL POWER SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY WILSON. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3341

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY WILSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Intervenor Defendants

VICTORIAN, JOSSLYN (AS NEXT FRIEND OF JADE SANAA HARRIS {A MINOR} AND

HARRIS, JADE SANAA (A MINOR)

Intervenor Plaintiffs

TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY

HARRIS, ROBERT (AS REPRESENTATIVE OF THE FAMILY ESTATE OF JEREL W

HARRIS, JEREL W (ESTATE OF)

Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

TIDAL POWER SERVICES LLC

COMRENT INTERNATIONAL LLC

SABINE PASS LNG L P

CHENIERE ENERGY INC

Intervenor Defendants

HARRIS, JADE SANAA (AS REPRESENTATIVE AND SOLE HEIR OF THE ESTATE OF

CHERIERE LLC

HARRIS, JEREL W (DECEDENT)

TIDAL POWER SERVICES LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION)

VICTORIAN, JOSSLYN (AS NEXT FRIEND OF JADE SANAA HARRIS {A MINOR} AND

TIDAL POWER SERVICES LLC

COMRENT INTERNATIONAL LLC

Other

SABINE PASS LNG L P (SUBSIDIARY OF CHENIERE ENERGY INC) MAY BE SERVED

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAPKIN, ANDREW L.

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorneys

ESPEY, RICHARD WILLIAM

ANGELA, M. REESE

Defendant Attorneys

KILPATRICK, JOHN CAMPBELL

FAHL, GLENN J.

COZORT, WILLIAM J. JR.

 

Court Documents

Plea In Intervention and Request for Disclosure

04/12/2016: Plea In Intervention and Request for Disclosure

Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel of Defendant Cheniere Energy, Inc.

04/12/2016: Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel of Defendant Cheniere Energy, Inc.

Citation by Mailing

04/12/2016: Citation by Mailing

Citation by Mailing

04/12/2016: Citation by Mailing

Certificate of Written Discovery

04/12/2016: Certificate of Written Discovery

Plaintiff's Certificate of Written Discovery to Tidal Power Services LLC

05/05/2016: Plaintiff's Certificate of Written Discovery to Tidal Power Services LLC

Plaintiff's Certificate of Written Discovery to Cheniere Energy Inc

05/05/2016: Plaintiff's Certificate of Written Discovery to Cheniere Energy Inc

Plaintiff's Certicate of Written Discovery to Comrent International LLC

05/06/2016: Plaintiff's Certicate of Written Discovery to Comrent International LLC

Cover Letter

05/10/2016: Cover Letter

Exhibit G

07/06/2016: Exhibit G

Defendant Cheriere Energy Incs Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Discovery and Request for Sanctions

07/06/2016: Defendant Cheriere Energy Incs Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Discovery and Request for Sanctions

Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition and Request For Disclosures, Written Interrogatories and Request for Production to Defendant Sabine Pass LNG LP

07/14/2016: Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition and Request For Disclosures, Written Interrogatories and Request for Production to Defendant Sabine Pass LNG LP

Certified Mail Receipt

07/27/2016: Certified Mail Receipt

Defendant, Cheniere Energy, Inc's Amended Answer

08/22/2016: Defendant, Cheniere Energy, Inc's Amended Answer

PLAINTIFF JOSSLYNN VICTORIAN'S CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY TO ALL PARTIES

10/25/2016: PLAINTIFF JOSSLYNN VICTORIAN'S CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY TO ALL PARTIES

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7015 1520 0002 4944 3552

11/11/2016: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7015 1520 0002 4944 3552

Filing letter

11/18/2016: Filing letter

ORDER SIGNED GRANTING LEAVE TO DESIGNATE RESPONSIBLE 3RD PARTY

12/19/2016: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING LEAVE TO DESIGNATE RESPONSIBLE 3RD PARTY

89 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2016
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING LEAVE TO DESIGNATE RESPONSIBLE 3RD PARTY; Order Signed: 12/19/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • Description: ANSWER SECOND AMENDED INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: COZORT, WILLIAM J. JR.; Person Filing: SABINE PASS LNG L P;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: ESPEY, RICHARD WILLIAM; Person Filing: TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: COZORT, WILLIAM J. JR.; Person Filing: SABINE PASS LNG L P;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • Description: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: COZORT, WILLIAM J. JR.; Person Filing: CHENIERE ENERGY INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • Description: SECOND AMENDED INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: ANGELA, M. REESE; Person Filing: HARRIS, JEREL W (ESTATE OF);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • Description: SECOND AMENDED INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: ANGELA, M. REESE; Person Filing: HARRIS, ROBERT (AS REPRESENTATIVE OF THE FAMILY ESTATE OF JEREL W;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • Description: SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DRAPKIN, ANDREW L.; Person Filing: VICTORIAN, JOSSLYN (AS NEXT FRIEND OF JADE SANAA HARRIS {A MINOR} AND;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Description: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2016
  • Description: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DRAPKIN, ANDREW L.; Person Filing: VICTORIAN, JOSSLYN (AS NEXT FRIEND OF JADE SANAA HARRIS {A MINOR} AND;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: ANGELA, M. REESE; Person Filing: HARRIS, JEREL W (ESTATE OF);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: ANGELA, M. REESE; Person Filing: HARRIS, ROBERT (AS REPRESENTATIVE OF THE FAMILY ESTATE OF JEREL W;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: ANGELA, M. REESE; Person Filing: HARRIS, ROBERT (AS REPRESENTATIVE OF THE FAMILY ESTATE OF JEREL W;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: KILPATRICK, JOHN CAMPBELL; Person Filing: TIDAL POWER SERVICES LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: ANGELA, M. REESE; Person Filing: HARRIS, JEREL W (ESTATE OF);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: ANGELA, M. REESE; Person Filing: Not Downloaded;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • Description: PLEA OF PRIVILEDGE; Filing Attorney: DRAPKIN, ANDREW L.; Person Filing: HARRIS, JADE SANAA (A MINOR);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • Description: PLEA OF PRIVILEDGE; Filing Attorney: DRAPKIN, ANDREW L.; Person Filing: VICTORIAN, JOSSLYN (AS NEXT FRIEND OF JADE SANAA HARRIS {A MINOR} AND;

    Read MoreRead Less