This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 11:37:24 (UTC).

VELASQUEZ, MYRIAN vs. CAMPBELL, LAUREN

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 VELASQUEZ, MYRIAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CAMPBELL, LAUREN. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7350

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VELASQUEZ, MYRIAN

Defendant

CAMPBELL, LAUREN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'MALLEY, KEVIN

Defendant Attorney

WULF, CHERYL ANN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2005
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, FINAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2004
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2004
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WULF, CHERYL ANN Person Filing - CAMPBELL, LAUREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - O'MALLEY, KEVIN Person Filing - VELASQUEZ, MYRIAN

    Read MoreRead Less