This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/30/2020 at 08:13:21 (UTC).

VEGA, ALFONSO vs. WATSON GRINDING AND MANUFACTURING CO

Case Summary

On 07/06/2020 VEGA, ALFONSO filed an Other lawsuit against WATSON GRINDING AND MANUFACTURING CO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9923

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RANGEL, ROSA

GONZALEZ, FERNANDO

VEGA, ALFONSO

FIGUEROA, GAUDENCIO GUZMAN

CASTILLO, FAUSTINO

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DETCON INC (D/B/A OLDHAM)

FIRESTONE CRYOGENICS INC

ARC SPECIALTIES INC

MATHESON TRI-GASINC

OLDHAM

DATAONLINE LLC

TRCC LLC

WATSON VALVE SERVICES INC

FIRESTONE CRYOGENIC EQUIPMENT INC

Defendant and Cross Defendant

WATSON VALVE SERVICES INC

Others

MATHESON TRI-GAS INC SERVING THROUGH ITS REGISTERED AGENT CT

Dallas, TX 75201

KMHJ LTD SERVING THROUGH ITS REGISTERED AGENT KMHJ

Houston, TX 77010

3M COMPANY SERVING THROUGH ITS REGISTERED AGENT CSC-LAWYERS

Austin, TX 78701

INDUSTRIAL SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION SERVING THROUGH ITS REGISTERED

Dallas, TX 75201

WATSON GRINDING AND MANUFACTURING CO SERVING THROUGH ITS REGISTERED

Houston, TX 77041

FIRESTONE CRYOGENIC EQUIPMENT INC SERVING THROUGH ITS REGISTERED

Houston, TX 77066

39 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALKER, STEPHEN R

6657 Navigation

Houston, TX 77011

Defendant Attorney

LAVIGNE, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL

2200 Ross Ave.

Dallas, TX 75201

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LOVETT, MARY OLGA

1000 Louisiana

Houston, TX 77002

Other Attorneys

TURNER, ROBERT CRAIG

17070 Dallas Par

Dallas, TX 75248

 

Court Documents

Western International Gas and Cylinders Inc and Matheson Tri-Gas Inc.'s Original Answer

07/16/2020: Western International Gas and Cylinders Inc and Matheson Tri-Gas Inc.'s Original Answer

Notice of Removal

07/17/2020: Notice of Removal

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION JURY DEMAND AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

07/06/2020: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION JURY DEMAND AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

Original Answer of Defendants KMHJ Ltd. and KMHJ Management Company LLC

07/07/2020: Original Answer of Defendants KMHJ Ltd. and KMHJ Management Company LLC

Western and Matheson Crossclaims Against Watson

07/08/2020: Western and Matheson Crossclaims Against Watson

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LAVIGNE, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL; Person Filing: WESTERN INTERNATIONAL GAS & CYLINDERS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LAVIGNE, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL; Person Filing: MATHESON TRI-GASINC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: CROSS ACTION; Filing Attorney: LOVETT, MARY OLGA; Person Filing: MATHESON TRI-GASINC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: CROSS ACTION; Filing Attorney: LOVETT, MARY OLGA; Person Filing: WESTERN INTERNATIONAL GAS & CYLINDERS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: TURNER, ROBERT CRAIG; Person Filing: KMHJ LTD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: TURNER, ROBERT CRAIG; Person Filing: KMHJ MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: INDUSTRIAL SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION SERVING THROUGH ITS REGISTERED; Issued: 7/7/2020; Tracking: 73764482; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: 3M COMPANY SERVING THROUGH ITS REGISTERED AGENT CSC-LAWYERS; Issued: 7/7/2020; Tracking: 73764429; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: KMHJ LTD SERVING THROUGH ITS REGISTERED AGENT KMHJ; Issued: 7/7/2020; Tracking: 73764413; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WALKER, STEPHEN R; Person Filing: FIGUEROA, GAUDENCIO GUZMAN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WALKER, STEPHEN R; Person Filing: GONZALEZ, FERNANDO;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WALKER, STEPHEN R; Person Filing: SANCHEZ, FRANCISCO;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WALKER, STEPHEN R; Person Filing: CONTRERAS, JOCABETH;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WALKER, STEPHEN R; Person Filing: RANGEL, ROSA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WALKER, STEPHEN R; Person Filing: CHAVEZ, MARTA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WALKER, STEPHEN R; Person Filing: ZAMARRON, SANTA MONICA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WALKER, STEPHEN R; Person Filing: FERMAN, LECTERIO;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WALKER, STEPHEN R; Person Filing: VEGA, ALFONSO;

    Read MoreRead Less