This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/08/2021 at 07:38:10 (UTC).

VASQUEZ, MELISSA vs. HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 VASQUEZ, MELISSA filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2067

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VASQUEZ, MELISSA

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

1019 Congress 15Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

SOUTHEAST TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER (SETCIC)

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION

205 W 14Th Street Suite 600,

Austin, TX 78701

Others and Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

1019 Congress 15Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker St

Houston, TX 77002

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L ROSE

500 Jefferson Suite 600

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY CLERK BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

Po Box 1525

Houston, TX 77251

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

201 Caroline 2Nd Floor

Houston, TX 77002

COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY PHD

49 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR

102 San Jacinto St

Houston, TX 77002

SOUTHEAST TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER

406 Caroline 2Nd Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERNANDEZ, ANDRES

7151 Office Cit

Houston, TX 77087

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2021
  • HearingCourt: 055; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION; Issued: 4/19/2021; Served: 4/27/2021; Tracking: 73862002; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SOUTHEAST TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER; Issued: 4/19/2021; Tracking: 73860645; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR; Issued: 4/19/2021; Tracking: 73860644; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY PHD; Issued: 4/19/2021; Tracking: 73860643; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE; Issued: 4/19/2021; Tracking: 73860641; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 4/19/2021; Tracking: 73860640; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY CLERK BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 4/19/2021; Tracking: 73860638; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L ROSE; Issued: 4/19/2021; Tracking: 73860637; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 4/19/2021; Tracking: 73860636; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 4/19/2021; Tracking: 73860634; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: SENSITIVE DATA DOCUMENT; Order Signed: 4/15/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 4/15/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FERNANDEZ, ANDRES; Person Filing: VASQUEZ, MELISSA;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHEAST TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER (SETCIC) ATTN: EXPUNCTION is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT is a litigant

Latest cases where COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY PHD is a litigant