This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:23:26 (UTC).

VASQUEZ, LINDA vs. COURREJOLLES, ETHEL

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 VASQUEZ, LINDA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COURREJOLLES, ETHEL. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8584

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

VASQUEZ, LINDA

COURREJOLLES, ETHEL

TURNING POINT P C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

LANIER, W. MARK

HAWES, RANDALL KYLE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2007
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2007
  • DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2007
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2007
  • AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POOL, AARON MARK Person Filing - HADDAD, LARRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED COMPELLING PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2006
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HAWES, RANDALL KYLE Person Filing - COURREJOLLES, ETHEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED THIRD PARTY PETITION : Filing Attorney - HAWES, RANDALL KYLE Person Filing - TURNING POINT P C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED THIRD PARTY PETITION : Filing Attorney - HAWES, RANDALL KYLE Person Filing - COURREJOLLES, ETHEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2005
  • ANSWER THIRD PARTY PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2005
  • THIRD PARTY PETITION : Filing Attorney - HAWES, RANDALL KYLE Person Filing - COURREJOLLES, ETHEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2005
  • THIRD PARTY PETITION : Filing Attorney - HAWES, RANDALL KYLE Person Filing - TURNING POINT P C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE 3RD PARTY ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE 3RD PARTY ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HAWES, RANDALL KYLE Person Filing - TURNING POINT P C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HAWES, RANDALL KYLE Person Filing - COURREJOLLES, ETHEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LANIER, W. MARK Person Filing - VASQUEZ, LINDA

    Read MoreRead Less