This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:10:41 (UTC).

VALTASAROS, GEORGIA M vs. TRAN, ANH LE

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 VALTASAROS, GEORGIA M filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TRAN, ANH LE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8398

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VALTASAROS, GEORGIA M

STRICKLAND, JAMES

Defendant

TRAN, ANH LE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DESIMONE, DONALD

Defendant Attorney

BUJOSA, NINA A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, FINAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2006
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2006
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2005
  • TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2005
  • TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2005
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2005
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BUJOSA, NINA A. Person Filing - TRAN, ANH KE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - DESIMONE, DONALD Person Filing - STRICKLAND, JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - DESIMONE, DONALD Person Filing - VALTASAROS, GEORGIA M

    Read MoreRead Less