This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/31/2020 at 07:49:04 (UTC).

UTEX INDUSTRIES INC vs. IN RE

Case Summary

On 07/07/2020 UTEX INDUSTRIES INC filed an Other lawsuit against IN RE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KYLE CARTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0261

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KYLE CARTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UTEX INDUSTRIES INC

Defendant

IN RE

Others

TEXAS MONOLINE LLC

TRAVIS, TODD

Humble, TX 77346

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZEVE, ANDREW WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Return of Service

07/14/2020: Return of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

07/07/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Exhibit 04

07/07/2020: Exhibit 04

Exhibit 03

07/07/2020: Exhibit 03

Exhibit 02

07/07/2020: Exhibit 02

Exhibit 01

07/07/2020: Exhibit 01

2020-07-07 Proposed Order Granting Rule 202 Deposition

07/07/2020: 2020-07-07 Proposed Order Granting Rule 202 Deposition

2020-07-07 Notice of Hearing

07/07/2020: 2020-07-07 Notice of Hearing

Verified petition for rule 202 deposition

07/07/2020: Verified petition for rule 202 deposition

Notice of Hearing

07/08/2020: Notice of Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2020
  • HearingCourt: 125; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: COMPEL APPEAR DEPO - MTN (TRCP 201); Requesting Party: ZEVE, ANDREW WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE (SHORT FORM); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TRAVIS, TODD; Issued: 7/8/2020; Served: 7/13/2020; Tracking: 73765192; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ZEVE, ANDREW WILLIAM; Person Filing: UTEX INDUSTRIES INC;

    Read MoreRead Less