This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 12/26/2016 at 10:38:53 (UTC).

USHER, LLC vs. VIR PRAYOSHA, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/23/2016 USHER, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VIR PRAYOSHA, INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE H PALMER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8803

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE H PALMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

UDDIN, TANVEER A/K/A TANVEER VAID

UDDIN, TANVEER

USHER, LLC

7322 Southwest Freeway

Houston, TX 77074

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

VIR PRAYOSHA, INC.

Other

VIR PRAYOSHA INC (IS A TEXAS CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARMEYER, WILLIAM F.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

PRASLA, FAHEEM NAZARALI

 

Court Documents

Exhibit 1

03/23/2016: Exhibit 1

Civil Case Information Sheet

03/23/2016: Civil Case Information Sheet

Plaintiff's Original Petition and request for injunctive and declaratory relief

03/23/2016: Plaintiff's Original Petition and request for injunctive and declaratory relief

Exhibit 3

05/24/2016: Exhibit 3

Exhibit 2

05/24/2016: Exhibit 2

Plaintiff's First Amended Petition and Request For Injunctive and Declaratory Relief

05/24/2016: Plaintiff's First Amended Petition and Request For Injunctive and Declaratory Relief

Civil Process Request Form

06/14/2016: Civil Process Request Form

Exhibit 3

06/14/2016: Exhibit 3

Exhibit 2

06/14/2016: Exhibit 2

Exhibit 1

06/14/2016: Exhibit 1

Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition and request for injunctive and declaratory relief

06/14/2016: Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition and request for injunctive and declaratory relief

CIVIL PROCESS PICK-UP FORM

06/20/2016: CIVIL PROCESS PICK-UP FORM

Citation (Executed)

07/12/2016: Citation (Executed)

Defendant's Original Answer

07/25/2016: Defendant's Original Answer

DCA Generic Letter

08/04/2016: DCA Generic Letter

Counter-Plaintiff Vir Prayosha, Inc's Original Counterclaim

08/08/2016: Counter-Plaintiff Vir Prayosha, Inc's Original Counterclaim

DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

09/12/2016: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants' Tanveer Uddin aka Tanveer Vaid and Usher Llc's Certificate of Written Discovery

09/23/2016: Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants' Tanveer Uddin aka Tanveer Vaid and Usher Llc's Certificate of Written Discovery

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2016
  • Description: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 9/12/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Description: COUNTER CLAIM; Filing Attorney: PRASLA, FAHEEM NAZARALI; Person Filing: VIR PRAYOSHA, INC.;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PRASLA, FAHEEM NAZARALI; Person Filing: VIR PRAYOSHA, INC.;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Description: SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HARMEYER, WILLIAM F.; Person Filing: UDDIN, TANVEER A/K/A TANVEER VAID;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Description: SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HARMEYER, WILLIAM F.; Person Filing: UDDIN, TANVEER;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Description: SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HARMEYER, WILLIAM F.; Person Filing: USHER, LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HARMEYER, WILLIAM F.; Person Filing: USHER, LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HARMEYER, WILLIAM F.; Person Filing: UDDIN, TANVEER A/K/A TANVEER VAID;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HARMEYER, WILLIAM F.; Person Filing: UDDIN, TANVEER;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HARMEYER, WILLIAM F.; Person Filing: USHER, LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less