This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/31/2020 at 07:23:44 (UTC).

USA CAR EXPO, LLC vs. CISNEROS, ROLAND (JR)

Case Summary

On 07/07/2020 USA CAR EXPO, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against CISNEROS, ROLAND JR. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE H PALMER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0039

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE H PALMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA CAR EXPO, LLC

Defendant

CISNEROS, ROLAND (JR)

Antonio, TX 78258

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THRASHER, DAVID ROYCE

 

Court Documents

Return of Citation of Service on Roland Cisneros, Jr.

07/28/2020: Return of Citation of Service on Roland Cisneros, Jr.

Request for Issuance-Roland Cisneros

07/07/2020: Request for Issuance-Roland Cisneros

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

07/07/2020: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CISNEROS, ROLAND (JR); Issued: 7/9/2020; Served: 7/14/2020; Tracking: 73765734; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: THRASHER, DAVID ROYCE; Person Filing: USA CAR EXPO, LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less