This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/20/2022 at 08:05:20 (UTC).

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION vs. SP PLUS CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SP PLUS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is C. ELLIOTT THORNTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2092

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

C. ELLIOTT THORNTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Defendant

SP PLUS CORPORATION

Other

SP PLUS CORPORATION MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING C/O RA CORPORATION

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOBES, JESSICA RAE WISLOCKI

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Original Petition

09/26/2022: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Request for Issuance of Service

09/26/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Citation SP PLUS Corporation

10/03/2022: Citation SP PLUS Corporation

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SP PLUS CORPORATION MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING C/O RA CORPORATION; Issued: 9/27/2022; Served: 9/29/2022; Tracking: 74056996; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LOBES, JESSICA RAE WISLOCKI; Person Filing: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SP Plus Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where United Services Automobile Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOBES JESSICA RAE WISLOCKI