This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/14/2018 at 17:42:22 (UTC).

ULISES STUCCO INC vs. PARKER, ROBERT

Case Summary

On 02/03/2016 ULISES STUCCO INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PARKER, ROBERT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL GOMEZ. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7162

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL GOMEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ULISES STUCCO INC

6613 Chimney Rock

Houston, TX 77081

Defendants

PARKER, ROBERT

Houston, TX 77019

HOUTEX BUILDERS LLC

2402 Elmen Street

Houston, TX 77019

CD HOMES LLC

2402 Elmen Street

Houston, TX 77019

Others

HOUTEX BUILDERS LLC (A DOMESTIC LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) BY SERVING

CD HOMES L L C (A DOMESTIC LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) BY SERVING ITS

Two Riverway Drive 15Th Floor

Houston, TX 77056

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GILBERT, ROBERT FRANCIS

Defendant Attorney

COULTER, KEITH EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Information Sheet

02/03/2016: Civil Case Information Sheet

Defendant Houtex Builders LLC's Original Answer and Requests for Disclosure

03/14/2016: Defendant Houtex Builders LLC's Original Answer and Requests for Disclosure

Defendant Robert Parker's Original Answer and Requests for Disclosure

03/14/2016: Defendant Robert Parker's Original Answer and Requests for Disclosure

Proposed Order

10/04/2016: Proposed Order

Proposed Order

10/04/2016: Proposed Order

Exhibit B-4

10/04/2016: Exhibit B-4

Exhibit B

10/04/2016: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

10/04/2016: Exhibit A

Defendants' Supplemental Answer

10/04/2016: Defendants' Supplemental Answer

Notice of Hearing on Defendants Houtex Builders LLC's and Robert Parker's Motions for Summary Judgment

10/05/2016: Notice of Hearing on Defendants Houtex Builders LLC's and Robert Parker's Motions for Summary Judgment

ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

10/07/2016: ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

Exhibit D

11/21/2016: Exhibit D

Exhibit A

11/21/2016: Exhibit A

Exhibit

11/21/2016: Exhibit

Plaintiff's First Amended Petition

11/22/2016: Plaintiff's First Amended Petition

SETTING REMINDER

01/25/2017: SETTING REMINDER

SETTING REMINDER

02/10/2017: SETTING REMINDER

Joint Motion for Non-Suit

03/09/2017: Joint Motion for Non-Suit

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2017
  • Description: EACH PAY OWN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Description: ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED; Order Signed: 3/23/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CARRASCO, LEO A.; Person Filing: ULISES STUCCO INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD; Order Signed: 10/7/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Description: SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GAINES, DUSTIN TYLER; Person Filing: HOUTEX BUILDERS LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Description: SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GAINES, DUSTIN TYLER; Person Filing: CD HOMES LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Description: SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GAINES, DUSTIN TYLER; Person Filing: PARKER, ROBERT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • Description: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 4/8/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Description: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GAINES, DUSTIN TYLER; Person Filing: PARKER, ROBERT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GAINES, DUSTIN TYLER; Person Filing: HOUTEX BUILDERS LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GAINES, DUSTIN TYLER; Person Filing: CD HOMES LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GILBERT, ROBERT FRANCIS; Person Filing: ULISES STUCCO INC;

    Read MoreRead Less